Anzo v. Janssen Research & Development, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anzo
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2015cv02217
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of New Jersey. CASE CLOSED.(Donati, J)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/14/2016 STAYING this case pending the resolution of the Motion to Transfer Cases pending before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. CASE STAYED. (Michel, G.)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/11/2016 ORDERING District Judge John A. Mendez is RECUSED; Case reassigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings; New Case Number: 2:15-CV-2217 KJM EFB. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anzo v. Janssen Research & Development, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anzo
Represented By: Michael Louis Kelly
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Ruth Thi Rizkalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?