Markus v. Aerojet RocketDyne Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Markus
Defendant: Aerojet RocketDyne Holdings, Inc. and Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc.
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2015cv02245
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/26/2019 CONTINUING the case deadlines as follows: Expert Disclosures - March 12, 2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures - April 10, 2020; Discovery Cut-Off & Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline - May 6, 2020; Deadline for Hearing All Other Motions - June 10, 2020; Pretrial Conference - August 31, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.; Jury Trial - October 27, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (Becknal, R)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/22/19. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM & ORDER Re: Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint, Stay Proceedings, And Compel Arbitration 50 , signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/8/2019: IT IS ORDERED that 50 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART. Count Three of relator's Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat 50 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED with respect to Counts Four, Five, and Six of relator's Second Amended Complaint. Proceedings as to Counts One and Two are not stayed. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/11/19 GRANTING 45 Stipulation to Extend Time, EXTENDING time to Respond to 42 Second Amended Complaint to 2/22/19. (Coll, A)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/20/18 EXTENDING the deadline for defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint to 12/14/2018. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 2/25/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 2/11/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER 33 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/18/2018 extending time for defendants to answer to the Amended Complaint by 11/30/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/27/18 ORDERING that the deadline for Defendants to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is EXTENDED by sixty (60) calendar days, through and including 9/28/2018.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/6/2018 ORDERING the case unsealed and served on defendants. The 22 First Amended Complaint and 25 Notice of Decline and this order shall be unsealed, all other previously filed content shall remain sealed. The Seal is LIFTED as to all other matter occurring in this action after the date of this order. (Hunt, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markus v. Aerojet RocketDyne Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Markus
Represented By: Gregory Anderson Thyberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerojet RocketDyne Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Richard Edwards(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?