Hall v. Sahota, et al.
Plaintiff: Rodney Hall
Defendant: Gurdeep Sahota, Nangalama, Kelly and Joerns
Case Number: 2:2015cv02267
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/05/18 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Rodney Hall on 10/10/18 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Cust odian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide the new Custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD)(3 certified copies of writ mailed to the Warden, California Health Care Facility)(Plummer, M) Modified on 9/5/2018 (Plummer, M).
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/30/2018 APPROVING 44 Stipulation; REFERRING this matter to the Prison Settlement Program for a Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; and EXTENDING all discovery deadlines 30 days from the date of the settlement conference. The deadline to file pretrial motions remains 1/31/2019 and all other provisions of 25 Discovery and Scheduling Order remain in effect. (cc: KJN) (Henshaw, R) Modified on 8/30/2018 (Streeter, J).
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/18/18 ORDERING that Attorney Thomas P. Feher is substituted in as attorney of record in place of Neli Nima Palma for defendant Sahota. (Plummer, M)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/16/18 ORDERING attorney Justin D. Harris is substituted in as attorney of record for plaintiff Rodney Hall. (Plummer, M)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/12/2017 ORDERING, within 30 days, the parties shall inform the court's Alernative Dispute Resolution division, in writing if they believe a settlement conference would be beneficial. (cc: ADR)(Yin, K)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/29/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Rodney Hall and forward payment to the court until the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/10/2015 DISMISSING plaintiff's 2 application to proceed IFP, without prejudice. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a completed ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Sahota, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurdeep Sahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nangalama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?