MTGLQ Investors, L.P. v. Campbell, et al.
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Defendant: Richard Campbell, Stephanie Campbell and Stephen Harmon
Case Number: 2:2015cv02317
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Rent, Lease, and Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1443
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/16 ORDERING the findings and recommendations filed 3/3/16 (ECF No. 12 ) are adopted in full; Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 4 ) is granted; This action is remanded to state c ourt under 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c), for lack of federal jurisdiction; The IFP application (ECF No. 2 ) is denied as moot; and Plaintiff's pending motion to remand the case to state court (ECF No. 14 ) also is denied as moot. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/03/16 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 4 Motion to Remand be granted; that action should be remanded to state court and that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP be denied as moot; referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to these F&Rs due within 21 days. (Benson, A)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/27/2016 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 4 Motion to Remand to 3/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTGLQ Investors, L.P. v. Campbell, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Represented By: Noah M. Bean
Represented By: Eric Gene Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?