Garduno v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: Steven Garduno
Defendant: Mike McDonald, Lopez and Denton
Case Number: 2:2015cv02370
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/22/2019 ORDERING the custodian to produce Steven Garduno #G-51309, to appear by video-conference before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/ 20/2019, at 9:00 a.m.; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and counsel for defendant shall confirm with the prison no less than two days prior to the settlement conference that the prison's video-conference equipment will connect to the court's system in accordance with this order. (cc: KJN; I.T. Dept) (Yin, K)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/27/19 ORDERING the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall provide to the Office of the California Attorney General copies of plaintiffs inmate statement reports for use in settlement proceedings. (cc: CDCR) (Plummer, M)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/15/2019. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall file the attached notice informing the court how he wishes to appear at the set tlement conference. The parties shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the settlement conference in accordance with this order The Clerk shall serve copies of this order on Deputy Attorney General Andrew Whisnand, and shall add Mr. Whisnand's name to the docket as the legal representative for defendants Lopez and Denton. (cc: Attorney Andrew James Whisnand)(Yin, K)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/16/2019 ADOPTED in FULL 24 Finding and Recommendations. Previously-named defendant Warden Mike McDonald is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. This case shall proceed on Plaintiff's remaining claims. (Reader, L)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/30/18 DIRECTING plaintiff to submit Service Documents and USM-285 Forms. Service is appropriate for defendants Lopez and Denton. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summo ns, 2 USM-285 Forms, 1 copy of the FAC and instructions for process to be completed and returned within 30 days after the filing of this order. The clerk is DIRECTED to randomly assign a district judge. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr added. It is further RECOMMENDED that defendant Warden Mike McDonald be dismissed from this action without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendation. New Case Number: 2:15-cv-2370-MCE-AC (PC). (Coll, A)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/03/17 ordering The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the instant order, together with a copy of the courts order filed October 20, 2016 16 on both plaintiff and Ms. Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. The deadlines set forth in the courts prior order are modified as follows: Within 30 days after the filing date of this order, a member of the Office of the Attorney General is requested to specially appear in t his action by filing and serving a statement that provides the correct identities and current service information for defendants Registered Nurse Cohen and Doctor Rahmon, or that sets forth the reasons why this information is unavailable. Within 30 d ays after the Office of the Attorney General files and serves a responsive statement, plaintiff is directed to file a proposed comprehensive First Amended Complaint setting forth all of his allegations and clearly identifying the challenged conduct of each defendant. (cc: Monica Anderson, Attorney General)(Plummer, M) Modified on 1/4/2017 (Plummer, M).
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/16 ordering Plaintiffs request for the courts assistance, 15 , is granted. The Office of the California Attorney General is requested to attempt to identify the full names and service addresse s for putative defendants Registered Nurse Cohen and Doctor Rahmon, both of whom previously worked at High Desert State Prison; and, within twenty-one(21) days after the filing date of this order, to specially appear in this action by filing a statem ent with the court, served on plaintiff, that provides the requested information or sets forth thereasons why this information is unavailable. Within thirty (30) days after the AG files and serves a responsive statement, plaintiff shall file a propo sed First Amended Complaint, on the form provided herewith, that incorporates all the allegations of plaintiffs original complaint and clearly identifies the challenged conduct of each named defendant. The Clerk of Court is directed to assist with t he following matters: (1) change the title of plaintiffs notice filed October 17, 2016, from Amended Complaint to Notice re. Identities of Doe Defendants; and (2) serve on plaintiff (i) a copy of this order; (ii) a copy of the original complaint (4 pp.) 1 ; and (iii) a copy of the form complaint used by prisoners in this district to pursue a civil rights action. (Plummer, M) Modified on 10/20/2016 (Plummer, M).
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Steven Garduno signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/14/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/19/15 ORDERING that plaintiff shall, within 30 days after the filing date of this order, submit to the court: (a) a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis o n the form provided herewith by the Clerk of Court; and (b) a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garduno v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Garduno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?