Wilson v. Tucci et al.
Plaintiff: David W. Wilson
Defendant: Nicole M. Tucci, David Silbaugh, Brian Duffy, Robert W. Fox, M. Voong, Gary Thomsor, M. Kaplan, J. Barclay, R. Rose, D. Huntly, T. Richardson, D. Anthony, J. Wieland, Santos, D. Artis and J.D. Lozoano
Case Number: 2:2015cv02404
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/20/2018 DISMISSING this action without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/19/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/13/18 DENYING the 28 Motion for Reconsideration. The 27 Court's previously imposed filing fee deadline has now lapsed. Given the delays occasioned by this motion for reconsideration, plaintiff shall have an additional 14 days to pay the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to pay the filing fee by this deadline will result in the dismissal of this action. (Benson, A.)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/2018 ADOPTING 23 Findings and Recommendations to the extent consistent with this order, and without reaching the substance of footnote 1 and DENYING 2 and 4 Motions to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is barred from proceeding in forma pauperis in this action under the three strikes provision. Within 30 days from the date of this order plaintiff shall pay the filing fee of $400.00 required for this action and Plaintiff's outstanding 7 , 8 , 9 , 10 , 11 , 13 , 14 , 18 , and 26 Motions are DENIED without prejudice to their renewal, as appropriate, upon payment of the required filing fee. (York, M)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/26/18 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 , 4 be denied, plaintiff be barred from proceeding in forma pauperis in this action under the 3 strikes provision of 28 USC 1915(g), all pending motions be denied as moot, and this case be dismissed without prejudice. Motions 2 and 4 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/10/17 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed September 7, 2016, are NOT ADOPTED; and this matter is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order.(Becknal, R)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/6/16 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docs. 2 , 4 ) be denied, plaintiff be barred from proceeding in forma pauperis in this action under the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (g), all pending motions be denied as moot, and this case be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Tucci et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole M. Tucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Silbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Voong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Thomsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barclay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Huntly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Lozoano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?