Medley v. McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Medley
Defendant: McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv02453
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/3/17: The deadline to file dispositional documents is extended from May 3, 2017 to May 24, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/28/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses extended from March 1, 2017 to April 3, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for disclosure of expert witnesses is EXTENDED from 1/16/2017 to 3/1/2017. (Zignago, K.)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/7/16 ORDERING that the fact discovery deadline is extended to December 15, 2016; the expert disclosure deadline is extended to January 16, 2017; and the expert discovery cut off is extended to March 16, 2017. The requested extension will not affect any of the other dates set in this case. (Becknal, R)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/1/16. (Kaminski, H)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/26/2016 GRANTING USA Waste of California Inc's 11 Motion to Intervene. USA Waste of California Inc. is now a party to the case. (Zignago, K.)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/8/16 ORDERING that the deadline for completion of fact discovery is EXTENDED to 10/15/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medley v. McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Medley
Represented By: Spencer James Pahlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeilus Truck and Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Vanis McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?