Konz v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rachael Konz
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv02476
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 7/11/17, ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear her or its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 [DISREGARD - CASE SETTLED] ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/19/17, ORDERING that each party shall file her or its Opening Trial Brief on 7/27/2017, Defendant shall lodge the Administrative Record on 7/27/2017, and each party shall file her or its Responding Trial Brief by 8/17/2017. The Hearing on the parties' Cross-Motions shall remain as scheduled on 9/21/2017 at 2:00 p.m. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 6/20/2017 (Deutsch, S).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Trial Briefing and Hearing on Cross Motions was GRANTED (ECF No. 13). Each party shall file her or its Opening Trial Brief on June 29, 2017. Defendant shall lodge the Administrative Record on June 29, 2017. Each party shall file her or its Responding Trial Brief by July 27, 2017. The Hearing on the parties' Cross-Motions shall be September 21, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/23/2017. (Deutsch, S)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/9/17, ORDERING that each party shall file her or its Opening Trial Brief on 5/25/2017. Defendant shall lodge the Administrative Record on 5/25/2017. Each party shall file her or its Responding Trial Brief by 6/15/2017. Cross-Motions shall remain as scheduled on June 29, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konz v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Konz
Represented By: David Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?