Perry v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Serisse Michelle Perry
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv02482
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/13/2017 DENYING 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 15 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/30/16 ORDERING the new due date for Defendant's motion for summary judgment will be Friday, July 1, 2016. (Becknal, R)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/16/2016 ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to respond to the 10 Motion for Summary Judgment by 6/15/2016. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serisse Michelle Perry
Represented By: Glenn M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?