(PC) Lipps v. Sutter Amador Hospital, et al
Plaintiff: William Lipps
Defendant: Heatly and Sutter Amador Hospital
Case Number: 2:2015cv02485
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Garland E Burrell
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, DTS-not here: #13 Order, #14 Judgment sent to William Lipps. Notice of Change of Address due by 10/16/2017. (Hunt, G)
July 27, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and #14 Judgment served on William Lipps. (Benson, A)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT dated *07/27/17* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 07/27/17. (Benson, A)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING #12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 07/27/17 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the court's order. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
July 11, 2017 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Unable to Forward: re #12 Findings and Recommendations sent to William Lipps. (Nguyen, K)
June 28, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on William Lipps. (Plummer, M)
June 28, 2017 Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/17/17 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the court's order. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2017 Filing 11 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #6 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on William Lipps. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of William Lipps signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
May 15, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on William Lipps. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/12/17 granting #6 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. All fees shall be paid in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with leave to amend within 30 days of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
July 11, 2016 Filing 8 REQUEST to proceed by William Lipps. (Becknal, R)(Response sent: "The Court will notify you as soon as any action is taken in your case.") Modified on 7/12/2016 (Plummer, M).
June 10, 2016 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR STATUS by William Lipps. (Reader, L)
January 4, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by William Lipps. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 22, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice served on William Lipps. (Yin, K)
December 15, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and ifp application served on William Lipps. (Yin, K)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/15/2015 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
December 15, 2015 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #3 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. and referred to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:15-cv-02485-GEB-AC. (Kaminski, H)
December 14, 2015 Filing 3 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Lipps. (Kaminski, H)
December 2, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on plaintiff William Lipps. (Marciel, M)
December 2, 2015 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/7/2016 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marciel, M)
November 30, 2015 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all defendants by plaintiff William Lipps. (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lipps v. Sutter Amador Hospital, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heatly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Amador Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?