Bonilla-Chirinos, et al. v. City of West Sacramento, et al.
Plaintiff: Guillermo Bonilla-Chirinos, Sandra Hernandez and J. B.
Defendant: City of West Sacramento and Kenneth Fellows
Case Number: 2:2015cv02564
Filed: December 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/24/2020 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. All parties are to bear their own attorneys fees and costs incurred in this action. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/2020 GRANTING 101 Motion to Approve Minor's Compromise. (Huang, H)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/29/19 ORDERING that Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Jury Trial RESET for 2/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Kaminski, H)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/5/2018 GRANTING 80 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/22/2018: The hearing on 80 Defendants' Motion to Stay is hereby RESET for 3/5/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, so that the motion can be heard jointly with the previously scheduled Final Pretrial Conference. Plaintiffs' opposition is due by 12:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 2/28/2018. Any reply is due by 12:00 p.m. on Friday, 3/2/2018. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/12/2018 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART defendants' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Zignago, K.)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/18/2017 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 42 City of West Sacramento's Bill of Costs, to refiling within fourteen days after judgment is entered as to all claims and defendants in this case. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/25/17. (Kaminski, H)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/17/17: The discovery cutoff date of April 21, 2017, is hereby extended for the limited purpose of allowing for the completion of the depositions of Guillermo Bonilla- Chirinos and Sandra Hernandez. Therefore, the depositions previously noticed for April 17 and 18, 2017, are hereby ordered reset for April 27 and 28, 2017, respectively. (Kaminski, H)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER Modifying the Pretrial Scheduling Order signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/16/16. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/23/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due 3/23/2017, Discovery due by 4/21/2017, Motions to be filed by 6/13/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Joint Pretrial Statements to be filed by 9/18/2017. Trial set for 11/14/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kastilahn, A)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/4/2016 GRANTING 22 Plaintiffs' Request for Substitution of Attorney. Added attorney Cyrus Zal for J. B., A Minor, Guillermo Bonilla-Chirinos, and Sandra Hernandez. The motion hearing date of 11/7/2016 is VACATED, no appearance is required. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/21/2016 ORDERING the Court hereby GRANTS the parties' foregoing stipulation for a protective order over all documents produced in this case. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla-Chirinos, et al. v. City of West Sacramento, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Bonilla-Chirinos
Represented By: Armando Silvestre Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Hernandez
Represented By: Armando Silvestre Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Armando Silvestre Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?