Wright et al v. Yanos et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Wright, Khrystyne Wright and Jonathan Wright
Defendant: Cyrus Yanos, Martin Ward, Amber Dunne, Amanda Ferguson, Paula Newman, John Ponder, Shiva Amin, Sheldon Suskauer, Scott A. Heatley, David Smiley and Joe A. Lizarraga
Case Number: 2:2015cv02671
Filed: December 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/12/20 EXTENDING Defendant Kernan's responsive pleading deadline by two weeks, or until April 27, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/27/2020 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 33 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Def endants Kernan and Lizarraga's Motion to Dismiss and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants Dunne, Ponder, Suskauer, Newman, Heatley, and Smiley's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, as follows:(1) The Motion to Dismiss the First Cause of Action is DENIED as to Kernan and GRANTED with leave to amend as to Defendant Lizarraga; (2) The Motion to Dismiss the Second Cause of Action against Defendant Lizarraga is GRANTED with prejudice; (3) The Motion to Dismiss the Third Cause of Action against Defendant Kernan is GRANTED with leave to amend; (4) The Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings as to the First Cause of Action against Defendants Dunne, Ponder, and Suskauer is DENIED; it is GRANTED with leave to amend as to De fendants Newman, Heatley, and Smiley; (5) The Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings as to the Second Cause of Action against Defendants Heatley and Smiley is GRANTED with prejudice; and (6) The Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings as to the Fourth Cause of action against Defendants Ponder, Newman, and Suskauer is GRANTED with leave to amend. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/23/18 ORDERING that pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2) and 15(c)(1)(C), the parties agree to permit the Plaintiffs to file the attached second amended complaint properly naming defendants Kernan and Lizarraga and with no other changes.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2017 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 16 Motion to Dismiss: GRANTS with leave to amend Motion to Dismiss Claim One; DENIES Motion to Dismiss Claim Two; GRANTS with leave to amend Motion to D ismiss Claim Three; GRANTS with leave to amend Motion to Dismiss Claim Four; and GRANTS with leave to amend Motion to Dismiss Claim Five. Should Plaintiffs wish to file an amended Complaint, such Complaint must be filed within thirty days of the entry of this Order. (Washington, S)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/23/2016 GRANTING 5 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time; ORDERING the defendants to respond to the 1 Complaint by 3/4/2016. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Yanos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Wright
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khrystyne Wright
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Wright
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyrus Yanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiva Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Suskauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A. Heatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe A. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?