Young v. Qureshi
Plaintiff: Danny Gerome Young
Defendant: Muhammad Qureshi
Case Number: 2:2015cv02674
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/25/2020 ORDERING the issue regarding payment of the money from the settlement agreement to plaintiff is deemed resolved. (Yin, K)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/20/2020 ORDERING if Plaintiff has not received payment of the money from the settlement agreement, Plaintiff to inform the Court within 21 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/02/19 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Danny Young by video conference on 12/03/19 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kenda ll J. Newman. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept. Sacramento) (Plummer, M)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/9/2019 ORDERING parties to return the attached form to the court within 14 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/20/19 ADOPTING 54 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief are dismissed. Defendant Clark is dismissed. Plaintiff's claim for damages for his alleged failure to receive injections of Golimumabis dismissed. 44 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. (Kaminski, H)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/01/19 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief be dismissed. Defendant Clark be dismissed. Plaintiff's claim for damages for his alleged fai lure to receive injections of Golmumab be dismissed. Defendants' summary judgment motion 44 , as it relates to plaintiff's claim for damages, be denied. Motion for Summary Judgment 44 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/29/2018 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed as moot. (Huang, H)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/16/18 ORDERING that, within thirty days from the dateof this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. (Plummer, M)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/19/18 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the order of the Magistrate Judge filed 11/20/17 is AFFIRMED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/2/2018 DIRECTING the Clerk to assign a District Judge to this case and update the docket to reflect the new case number. This case is assigned to US District Judge John A. Mendez and US Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; the new case number is 2:15-cv-2674 JAM KJN (PC).(Yin, K)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/20/17 GRANTING 34 Motion to amend the scheduling order. The discovery deadline, for all parties is reset to 2/09/18. The dispositive motion deadline is extended to 4/13/18; all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before that date. (Plummer, M)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/1/2017 DENYING without prejudice 35 Motion for Leave to Amend. (Henshaw, R)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/25/17 granting 30 Motion to opt out of the ADR Project. The order referring this action to the ADR project 26 is vacated. The stay in this action is lifted. (Plummer, M)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/26/2017. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigne d DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy, Matt Caspar, within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) (Yin, K)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/12/17 ordering the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff 1 USM-285 form, instruction sheet and a copy of the 2/16/16 amended complaint to be completed and returned with the Notice of Submission of Documents within 60 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/17/2017 DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's 16 motion to file a supplemental complaint and motion for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Danny Gerome Young signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/29/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/13/16 ordering that within 14 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall inform the court whether he wishes to proceed with this action. (Plummer, M)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/14/16 ordering plaintiff's 12/28/15 request for preliminary injunctive relief 1 is denied. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to send to plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action and the application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Gerome Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muhammad Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?