Rehana v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anita M. Rehana
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00006
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/28/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; the Commissioner's 18 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/8/16 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiff to file her MOTION for Summary Judgment in this action is EXTENDED through 8/12/16. No additional extensions of time will be grant ed to Plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED through 10/15/16. All other aspects of the Scheduling Order previously issued in this action remain unchanged. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/11/16 ORDERING that the date for plaintiff to file the Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 08/05/16. (Benson, A)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/5/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is f urther directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within fourteen days, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal an original and five copies of the completed summons, five copies of the complaint, and five copie s of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehana v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita M. Rehana
Represented By: Jared Thomas Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cynthia B. De Nardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?