Lara v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Brunilda A. Lara
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00034
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/8/2018 GRANTING 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. Counsel for plaintiff is awarded $13,896.25 in attorney fees under § 406(b). Upon receipt of the $13,896.25 in attorney fees pursuant to § 406(b), counsel shall reimburse plaintiff in the amount of $8,946.43 previously paid by the government under the EAJA. (Zignago, K.)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/17/2017 GRANTING 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $8,946.43 in attorney fees. Defendant is directed to determine whether plaintiffs EAJA attorneys fees are subject to any offset permitted under the United States Department of the Treasurys Offset Program and, if the fees are not subject to an offset, shall cause payment of fees to be made directly to plaintiff. (Hunt, G)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/28/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; defendant's 17 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED; this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/20/16 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand is now due on 8/14/16. (Washington, S)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/8/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 5 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshals Service wit hin fourteen days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the Court that said documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal; ORDERING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunilda A. Lara
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?