Le v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Plaintiff: Johnny Phong Le
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00039
Filed: January 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/11/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 20 Stipulation, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, in its entirety, each party to bear its own fees and costs, pursuant to Fed. Rule Civ. Proc. 41(a). CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/5/2016. The undersigned settlement conference judge has purchased an Equifax identity protection product for the last 5-10 years. The undersigned does not presently believe that this associ ation with Equifax requires his recusal for a settlement conference dealing with an alleged failure by Equifax to correct a credit report. However, if any party disagrees, that party shall file a request for recusal no later than 10/12/2016. (Zignago, K.)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/12/16. The Court hereby appoints Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows to conduct a Settlement Conference pursuant to Local Rule 270. The parties are directed to contact Judge Hollows' Courtroom Deputy, Jonathan Anderson, at 916-930-4072 to schedule said conference. The parties are further Ordered to file a Joint Status Report not later than ten (10) days after the Settlement Conference has been concluded.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/29/16. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Le v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas Patrick Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Phong Le
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?