Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joel Hernandez Martinez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00101
Filed: January 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/18/18 GRANTING 38 Motion for Attorney Fees, AWARDING plaintiff EAJA attorney's fees in the amount of $11,228.81, payable directly to plaintiff by the Commissioner within 65 days. (Coll, A)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/30/18, ORDERING that Defendant's response to Plaintiff's EAJA Motion shall be on or before 9/28/2018 and Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be on or before 10/12/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/2/2018 ORDERING the hearing for 38 Motion for Attorney Fees is removed from calendar and the matter will be submitted upon completion of briefing on the record. (Washington, S)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/1/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 21 is GRANTED; Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 33 is DENIED; This matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order. And The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/26/2018 ORDERING the Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (Becknal, R)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/04/17 ORDERING that Defendant's time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 10/18/17. (Benson, A.)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/27/2017 ORDERING that Defendant's time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 10/4/2017.(Reader, L)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/12/2017 ORDERING 21 that the time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joel Hernandez Martinez, is EXTENDED to 9/26/2017.(Reader, L)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/26/17: The time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is extended from August 3, 2017 to September 5, 2017.(Kaminski, H)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/08/17 ORDERING that plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file a dispositive motion. (Benson, A)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/24/2017 ORDERING the plaintiff to file a Motion for Summary Judgment by 5/29/2017. (Michel, G.)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/3/2017 Plaintiff's Summary Judgment is due by 5/15/2017. (Washington, S)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/8/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 5 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases, ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal within 15 days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Complaint and to file a statement with the court of such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Hernandez Martinez
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?