Lee v. Owens
Plaintiff: Ben Lee
Defendant: Ken Owens
Case Number: 2:2016cv00123
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/28/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 19 be granted adn the claims against defendant Owens be dismissed. Judgment be entered for defendant. Motion for Summary Judgment 19 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/28/18 ORDERING that within 21 days after service of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/12/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to file amended complaint as outlined in 5/26/2017 screening order within 30 days from the service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ben Lee signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/26/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?