T., et al v. Sacramento City School District
Plaintiff: Jay T., M. M. T. and Anne M. T.
Defendant: Sacramento City Unified School District
Case Number: 2:2016cv00136
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT dated *8/22/2017* signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/21/2017 re 33 Order. (Michel, G.)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part 21 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/20/17. (Kaminski, H)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/29/16 ORDERING the briefing schedule in this action to be extended, as follows: District's Opposition Memorandum (limited to 25 pages) and supporting papers shall be filed on or before October 14, 2016; and plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum (limited to 15 pages) and supporting papers shall be filed by no later than November 4, 2016; The hearing on the merits in this matter set for November 17, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., shall remain on calendar as scheduled.(Becknal, R)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/12/16: Plaintiffs' Opening Memorandum in Support of an Award of Attorneys' Fees shall be filed on or before August 31, 2016. Opposition Memorandum shall be fil ed on or before September 30, 2016. Reply Memorandum shall be filed by no later than 14 days after the District's Opposition Memorandum is filed. HEARING set for 11/17/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. on the merits of the Motion. (Kaminski, H)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/17/16 ORDERING that plaintiffs' opening memorandum in support of an award of attorneys' fees is due by 07/22/16; District's opposition due by 08/19/16; plaintiffs' reply due no later than 14 days after the District's opposition is filed; and a hearing is set for 09/22/16 at 2:00 p.m. before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Benson, A)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 01/26/16 GRANTING 3 Motion to Appoint ad Litem. Jay T. and Anne M.-T appointed as guardian ad litem for M. M.-T. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T., et al v. Sacramento City School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay T.
Represented By: Colleen A. Snyder Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. M. T.
Represented By: Colleen A. Snyder Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne M. T.
Represented By: Colleen A. Snyder Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento City Unified School District
Represented By: Sloan Robert Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?