Chapman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Julie Karen Chapman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00212
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/27/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 14 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's 22 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED, and judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/2016 ORDERING that the new due date for Defendant's responsive brief will be Monday, 11/21/2016. (Jackson, T)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/20/16 ORDERING that Defendant shall have a second extension of time of 30 days to file her responsive brief. The new due date for Defendant's responsive brief will be Monday, 11/7/2016.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. Service of process is appropriate for the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Karen Chapman
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?