Wilson v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Fred Wilson
Defendant: Robert Fox, M. Collins, Joseph Bick, N. Saukhla, S. Jensen, R Sanders, Omar, M. Ditomas and J. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2016cv00219
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/07/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 35 be granted, and judgment be entered in favor of defendants. This case be closed. Motion for Summary Judgment 35 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/9/2019 GRANTING 39 Motion for a Continuance and CONTINUING the 35 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing to 2/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Plaintiff shall file a response to 35 Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 2/6/2019. Failure to file a response will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Huang, H)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/3/2019 ORDERING the 35 Motion for Summary Judgment CONTINUED to 2/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Plaintiff shall file a response to defendants' motion for summary judgment no later than 1/23/2019. (Washington, S)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER adopting in full 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/11/18. All of plaintiff's claims against defendants Fox, Collins, Bick, Ditomas, and Jenden and his § 1985 and § 1986 claims against defendants Saukhla, Osman, and Sanders are DISMISSED without leave to amend. Within 21 days of the filing of this order, defendants Saukhla, Osman, and Sanders shall respond to the first amended complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/10/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the court is directed to strike the second amended complaint 29 from the record. Defendants Saukhla, Osman, and Sanders will be requi red to respond to the first amended complaint 25 as set forth above in Section III.A. Their response shall be due 21 days after the U.S. District Judge assigned to this case rules on the findings and recommendations. Also, RECOMMENDING that all o f plaintiff's claims against defendants Fox, Collins, Bick, Ditomas, and Jenden and his section 1985 and 1986 claims against defendants Saukhla, Osman, and Sanders be dismissed without leave to amend. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/06/17 ORDERING plaintiff shall have 30 days from the service of this order to file a second amended complaint as outline in the 11/17/17 screening order. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner complaint form used in this district.(Plummer, M)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/17/2017 ORDERING all of plaintiff's claims against defendants Fox, Collins, Bick, Ditomas and Jenden, and his § 1985 and § 1986 claims against defendants Saukhla, Osman and Sanders are DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff has the option to proceed immediately on his deliberate indifference claims against defendants defendants Saukhla, Osman and Sanders as set forth in Section I.A above, or to amend the complaint. Withi n 14 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached form notifying the court on how he wants to proceed. The deadlines set forth in the 10/25/2017 discovery and scheduling order are VACATED and discovery is STAYED pending issuance of a new discovery and scheduling order.(Yin, K)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/12/2017 GRANTING 11 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Fox, Collins, Bick, Ditomas, Jensen, and Lewis are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff has the option to proceed immediately on his medical indifference claims against defendants Saukhla, Omar, and Sanders as set forth in Section IV.C, or to amend the complaint. Within 14 days of service of this order, plaintiff to complete and return attached form notifying the court whether he wants to proceed on the screened complaint or whether he wants to file a first amended complaint. (Henshaw, R)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/6/2016 DENYING without prejudice plaintiff's 2 motion to proceed IFP; within 30 days, plaintiff must either pay the filing fee in full or submit a non-prisoner application to proceed ifp; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a blank ifp application used by non-prisoners. (Yin, K)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO United States District Court, Eastern District of California, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/3/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016) [Transferred from cand on 2/4/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Saukhla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ditomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?