United States of America v. Approximately $98,100.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $98,100.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $35,900.00 in U.S. Currency and Approximately $40,000.00 in Money Orders
Case Number: 2:2016cv00233
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/08/17. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/11/2017 ORDERING that the Settlement Conference is CONTINUED to 8/7/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Each party is directed to submit to the chambers of Judge Carolyn K. Delaney confidential settlement conference statements no later than 7/31/2017. (Zignago, K.)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/20/2017 CONTINUING the Settlement Conference to 5/22/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; ORDERING each party to submit confidential settlement conference statements to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney by 5/8/2017. (Michel, G.)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/2016 ORDERING that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/9/2016, is VACATED and RESET for 8/18/2016, at 2:30 p.m., with the joint status report due no later than 8/11/2016. (Zignago, K.)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/9/2016 ORDERING The USA applies for an order of publication; Rule G(4) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions (hereafter "S upplemental Rules") provides that the United States shall cause public notice of the action to be given in a newspaper of general circulation or on the official internet government forfeiture site. A statement that answers to the Complaint or a motion under Rule 12 of the FRCP must be filed and served within 21 days after the filing of the claims and, in the absence thereof, default may be entered and condemnation ordered. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $98,100.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $98,100.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $35,900.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $40,000.00 in Money Orders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?