Givens v. Muniz
Petitioner: DeErick Eronn Givens
Respondent: W. L. Muniz
Case Number: 2:2016cv00249
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/26/2017 RECOMMENDING respondent's 17 motion to dismiss be granted, and this case be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a cognizable claim. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/28/2016 ORDERING, within 7 days, respondent shall re-serve on petitioner, at CSP-SAC, a copy of his 17 motion to dismiss and supporting exhibits. Petitioner shall, within 30 days, file and ser ve an opposition or statement of non-opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss. Within 14 days after service of petitioner's response, respondent may serve and file a reply. Petitioner is informed that failure to timely comply with this order and/or failure to promptly notify the court and respondent of any further change in address will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). The Clerk shall indicate on the court's docket that petitioner's current address is CSP, Sacramento, and to serve this order on petitioner at that address.(Yin, K)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/7/16 ORDERING, within 21 days, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition or statement of non-opposition to respondent's pending 17 motion to dismiss.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeErick Eronn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: W. L. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?