Garcia v. Greenleaf et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Garcia
Defendant: Delmar Greenleaf, Randall Lankford, Salahuddin Abdur-Rahman, L Jones, Rouer, Woodward, Paul C Ludlow, OT Smith and C. Lipton
Case Number: 2:2016cv00269
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/12/2019 ORDERING, based on the by the parties' 62 stipulation, on or before 3/13/2020 the parties shall disclose expert testimony as set out in Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2). All expert discovery, including any motions to compel discovery, shall be completed by 4/17/2020. (Yin, K)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/24/19 ORDERING ( Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes.) Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the subjects set out in Local Rule 282, as well as any other subjects counsel feel are necessary for trial preparation. (Plummer, M)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/28/2019 ORDERING Plaintiff to file a pretrial statement pursuant to Local Rule 281 within 30 days of the filed date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/12/19 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Brandon Michael Garcia by video-conferencing on 08/21/19 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento)(3 certified copies of writ mailed to the Warden, CSATF. Courtesy copy of writ sent by fax to Litigation Coordinator at CSATF at 559-992-7206)(Plummer, M) Modified on 6/13/2019 (Plummer, M).
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/10/19 ORDERING ( Settlement Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes., An informal telephonic conference is set for 8/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes.) (Plummer, M)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/20/2019 ORDERING the parties to meet and confer regarding a settlement conference within 20 days of the date of this order; ORDERING if the parties agree that a settlement conference at this junct ure would be useful, within 20 days they shall file a joint statement so informing the court as detailed in this order; and ORDERING if the parties do not agree that a settlement conference would be useful, then within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a pretrial statement pursuant to Local Rule 281. (Henshaw, R)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/16/2019 ADOPTING 43 Finding and Recommendations in full and DENYING 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Huang, H)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/11/2019 RECOMMENDING defendants' 27 motion for summary judgment be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/11/19 GRANTING 38 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is GRANTED until 2/1/19 to file their opposition to 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Coll, A)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/29/18 GRANTING 36 Motion for 42-Day Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opposition to 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 1/11/19. (Coll, A)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/18/2018 GRANTING 34 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Opposition to 27 Motion for Summary Judgment will be due on or before 11/30/2018. (Huang, H)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/25/2018 APPROVING the parties' stipulation to the modification of the Discovery and Scheduling Order. The modified dates are now as follows: Discovery and Discovery Motion is due by 3/30/2018; Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 6/29/2018. (Yin, K)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/03/17 for modification of the discovery and scheduling order ( Discovery deadline continued to 1/30/2018. Dispositive Motion deadline continued to 4/23/2018.) (Plummer, M)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/24/2017 GRANTING plaintiff's 7 application to proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent CDCR order. Plaintiff's claims against the following defendants are DISMISSED with leave to amend: Lipton, Rouer, OT Smith, POC, Lankford, Woodward, Ludlow, and Does 1-20. If plaintiff chooses to amend the complaint, he shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days.(Yin, K)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/18/2016 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a complted application to proceed ifp; and a certified trust account statement. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Greenleaf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Garcia
Represented By: Julia Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmar Greenleaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salahuddin Abdur-Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul C Ludlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OT Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?