Broadnax v. Adams & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sheila Broadnax
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00289
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 08/13/18 GRANTING 29 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/14/2018 ORDERING cases 2:16-cv-289-TLN-KJN and 2:18-cv-00472-KJM-DB are RELATED. The action denominated 2:18-cv-00472-KJM-DB, is REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:18-cv-00472-TLN-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/5/2017 ORDERING 18 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is hereby GRANTED as to all claims with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of this Order. (Reader, L)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/27/2017 FINDING that this action is related to the action denominated 2:17-cv-00173 JAM CKD within the meaning of Local Rule 123(a); REASSIGNING the related case to Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G.)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/28/16 ORDERING cases 2:16-cv-1309-WBS-AC, 2:16-cv-2300-WBS-AC and 2:16-cv-00289-TLN-KJN are related. Actions denominated 2:16-cv-01309-WBS-AC and 2:16-cv-02300-WBS-AC are hereby reassign ed to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:16-cv-01309-TLN-KJN and 2:16-cv 02300-TLN-KJN. (Washington, S)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/22/2016 DENYING Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Remand. (Jackson, T)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/6/2016 FINDING that this action is related to the actions denominated 2:16-cv-00958 MCE KJN, 2:16-cv-00960 JAM KJN; REASSIGNING said cases to Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for a further proceedings; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment and issue. (Michel, G.)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/22/16 ORDERING that case 2:16-cv-0494 TLN KJN be RELATED to case numbers 2:16-cv-0289 TLN KJN, 2:16-cv-0292 TLN KJN, 2:16-cv-0303 TLN KJN, 2:16-cv-0314 TLN KJN and 2:16-cv-0311 TLN KJN. (Benson, A)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/2/16, ORDERING that the actions denominated 2:16-cv-00292-KJM-EFB, 2:16-cv-00303-JAM-AC, 2:16-cv-311-TLN-AC, and 2:16-cv-314-MCE-KJN are hereby reassigned to District Judge Tr oy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall Newman for all further proceedings. Any dates currently set in the reassigned cases are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:16-cv-00292-TLN-KJN, 2:16-cv-00303- TLN-KJN, 2:16-cv-311- TLN-KJN, and 2:16-cv-314- TLN-KJN. The Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment and issue. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadnax v. Adams & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Broadnax
Represented By: William Lawrence Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Gayland Pedhirney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?