Mizerak v. Eslick et al
Plaintiff: John Samuel Mizerak, Jr.
Defendant: Eslick and Foxworthy
Case Number: 2:2016cv00323
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/19/18 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(b). Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/29/17 ORDERING within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendant El Dorado County Sheriff's Office motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition. The hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 on the motion to dismiss is vacated and will be re-set, if necessary, at a later date. (Plummer, M)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/18/2017 GRANTING 47 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is granted until 11/20/2017 to file an opposition to defendant Eslick and Foxworthys motion to dismiss. (Hunt, G)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/2/2017 ORDERING that, with respect to motion practice, this action will proceed under Local Rule 230 in general and not Local Rule 230(l) specifically. However, defendants' pending motion to dismiss will still proceed under Local Rule 230(l). (Henshaw, R)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/8/2016 DENYING plaintiff's 27 motion for appointment of counsel, without prejudice. (Yin, K)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/7/16 ORDERING the Sheriff of El Dorado County to collect and forward payment from the trust account of John Samuel Mizerak, Jr. and forward payment to the court unt il the balance is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Sheriff of El Dorado County; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/24/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the C lerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mizerak v. Eslick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Samuel Mizerak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eslick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?