Guinn v. Sugar Transport of the Northwest, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ryan Guinn
Defendant: Sugar Transport of the Northwest, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00325
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/1/18. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Request for Dismissal with Prejudice 112 of this action as against Sugar Transport be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/7/18: Final Pretrial Conference continued to 12/3/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Hearing as to 90 Motion for Summary Judgment moved to 10/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/13/2018 ORDERING that 98 Motion for Approval of Settlement and Request for Dismissal of this action as against settling defendants Bronco and Classic be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's request for a Determination of Good Faith Settlement pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure § 877 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. (Washington, S)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 05/22/18 ORDERING that dates are MODIFIED as follows: the deadline for Plaintiff and Bronco and Classic to notice all discovery-related motions pertaining to discovery propounded by and between them, including motions to compel discovery, is 07/13/18; the deadline for Bronco to file dispositive pre-trial motions as to Plaintiff only is 08/17/18; hearing on 90 Motion for Summary Judgment is RESET for 9/17/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Jury Trial set for 1/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A.)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/18, ORDERING that the deadline to complete the Document Inspection referenced in No. 1, of this order, is extended to 4/25/18. The deadline to complete the Depositions refe renced in No. 1, is extended to 5/4/18. The deadline to complete all other discovery, including written discovery and depositions, shall remain as 4/19/18. The deadline for the Parties to move to compel the Document Inspection and Depositions referenced in No. 1, in this order, is extended to 5/4/18. The deadline for the Parties to notice all other discovery-related motions shall remain as 4/19/18. (Kastilahn, A)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 70 Plaintiff's MOTION FOR PROCEEDING AS COLLECTIVE ACTION AND FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/2017 ORDERING Disclose of Expert Witnesses EXTENDED to 2/20/2018; Disclose expert witnesses intended solely for rebuttal EXTENDED to 3/14/2018; Parties to complete Discovery is EXTENDED to 4/19 /2018; Parties to notice all discovery is EXTENDED to 4/19/2018; Non-Dispositive motions EXTENDED to 4/19/2018; Dispositive Motions EXTENDED to 5/7/2018; Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 6/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and Trial Reset to 8/21/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Reader, L)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION and ORDER 73 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/13/2017 continuing the hearing on 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class to 12/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, with briefing in accordance with the Local Rules. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/17/17: The deadline for Plaintiff to file his motion for class certification is extended to September 18, 2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/30/2017. Discovery due by 1 /19/2018. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/16/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Trial set for 6/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/25/2017. (Michel, G.)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/21/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion for class certification is EXTENDED from 5/1/2017 to 6/12/2017. (Zignago, K.)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/23/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/31/2017. Discovery due by 9/15/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 9/29/2017. Final Pretrial Conference continued to 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Trial continued to 12/12/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER 53 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/26/2017 extending time for plaintiff to file a motion for class certification by 5/1/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/24/2017 re 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend his Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to his Motion (Docket No. 37 Ex. 1) within five days of the date this Order is signed. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/13/2017 GRANTING 45 Plaintiff's Application to appear by telephone at the 1/23/2017 motion hearing. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the hearing via telephone. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/23/16 ORDERING that The deadline for the Parties to disclose Expert Witnesses is EXTENDED from 9/10/16 to 12/9/16, with the disclosure of any rebuttal Expert Witnesses regarding clas s certification EXTENDED from 9/25/16 12/27/16. The deadline for the Parties to disclose those experts is EXTENDED from 11/28/16 to 2/28/17, with the deadline to disclose expert witnesses intended solely for rebuttal at trial and produce their repo rts is EXTENDED from 12/27/16, to 3/27/17. The deadline to complete all Discovery, is EXTENDED from 1/27/17 to 4/27/17. The date by when all motions to compel discovery must be noticed on the Magistrate Judges calendar is EXTENDED from 1/27/17 to 4 /27/17. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a Motion for Class Certification is EXTENDED from 10/31/16 to 1/31/17. The deadline for filing all other Motions, except Motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applicat ions, is EXTENDED from 2/27/17 to 3/30/17. The Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED from 4/24/17 to 7/31/17 at 1:30 P.M. in Courtroom No. 5. Trial is CONTINUED from 5/31/17 to 9/26/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ***DISREGARDED***ORDER Following Settlement; Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents within Seven Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/11/2016. (Flores, E)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER regarding Notice of Class Action Lawsuit signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/2/16. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinn v. Sugar Transport of the Northwest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Guinn
Represented By: Ian A. Kass
Represented By: James L. Pagano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sugar Transport of the Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Alan Sam Levins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?