Stribling v. Mott et al

Plaintiff: Aaron Stribling
Defendant: R Mott, J. Terry, G. Morrow, G. Johnson, Muarillo, R. H. Molina, Glenn, Salz, Andrichuck and Schnider
Case Number: 2:2016cv00400
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/28/19 DENYING 95 Motion for disqualification. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motions for terminating sanctions 96 , 97 be granted and this action be dismissed for failure to comply with a court order. Motions 96 , 97 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 02/27/19 DENYING 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to provide plaintiff with a copy of Local Rule 260. (Plummer, M)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/08/19 GRANTING 83 Motion for Extension of time and DENYING 84 , 85 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall have until 3/15/19 to provide supplemental responses to defendants' discove ry requests in compliance with the 8/29/18 order. No further extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary cause. Defendants shall have until 4/15/19, to file any motions for sanctions based on plaintiff's failure to com ply with the 8/29/18 order. Dispositive motions will be due within 30 days of the resolution of any motions for sanctions. If no motions for sanctions are filed, dispositive motions will be due thirty days after the deadline for filing motions for sanctions expires. (Plummer, M)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/22/2019 ORDERING, within 14 days, defendants shall respond to plaintiff's allegation that he as been separated from his property since 6/21/2018, thereby leaving him unable to respond to their discovery requests as ordered; and DENYING plaintiff's 83 motion for disqualification. (Yin, K)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/22/2018 ORDERING plaintiff shall serve his supplemental responses to defendants' discovery requests by 11/9/2018. Defendants shall have until 12/17/2018 to file any motions for sanctions based on plaintiff's failure to comply with the 8/29/2018 order. Defendants' 81 motion is GRANTED to the extent that the dispositive motion deadline is VACATED. Dispositive motions will be due within thirty days of the resolution of any motions for sanctions. If no motions for sanctions are filed, dispositive motions will be due thirty days after the deadline for filing motions for sanctions expires. (Yin, K)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/15/18 DENYING 77 Motion for Reconsideration. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/29/2018 GRANTING 49 Motion to Compel, within 30 days of service of this order plaintiff must provide supplemental responses to defendant Mott's Interrogatory Nos. 1-3 and Request for Pro duction Nos. 1-5 without any further objection; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 59 Motion to Compel, as detailed in this Order; GRANTING 60 Motion to Compel, within 30 days of service of this order, plaintiff must fully respond to defendant Salz' requests for production and interrogatories without objection. The parties to have 60 days from service of this order to bring any motions for sanctions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b) for failure to comply with this order. (Henshaw, R)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/5/2018 ORDERING plaintiff shall have 14 days to file a reply to defendants' 64 opposition to his motion to compel. (Yin, K)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to respond to 49 Motion to Compel within 21 days from service of this order and DENYING without prejudice 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Henshaw, R)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/20/17 DENYING 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/24/17 ORDERING plaintiff's motion for entry of default 37 is denied. The 9/25/17 order to show cause 36 is discharged. (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/25/2017 DENYING 35 Request to Exclude the Answer filed by defendants Mott, Terry, Morrow, Johnson, Murillo, Molina, Glenn, Andrichuck, and Schnider and to Enter Default Judgment against defendant Salz and ORDERING within 14 days of service of this order, defendant Salz must file and serve a response to the complaint and verified statement showing cause for the delay and why sanctions should not be imposed. (Henshaw, R)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/12/16 denying 15 Motion to alter judgment. (Plummer, M)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/14/16 ORDERING that this Action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/05/16 denying 9 Motion for Reconsideration and granting 10 Motion for Extension for extension of time such that the motion for reconsideration is considered timely. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint as set forth in 04/05/16 order. (Plummer, M)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Aaron Stribling signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/05/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stribling v. Mott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Stribling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muarillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. H. Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrichuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schnider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?