Battle v. Martinez
Petitioner: Noah H.O. Battle
Respondent: Joel Martinez
Case Number: 2:2016cv00411
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/1/2017 RECOMMENDING respondent's 16 motion to dismiss be granted and this case closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/07/16 ordering that petitioner file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss no later than 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/9/16 ORDERING that Respondent's request to seal documents (ECF No. 17 ) is GRANTED; and Respondent's motion to dismiss the petition and Exhibit A accompanying the motion (ECF Nos. 16 & 16 -1) are to be filed under seal, nunc pro tunc, as of the date of filing.(Dillon, M)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/6/2016 DENYING without prejudice petitioner's 11 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Noah H.O. Battle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?