Englehart et al. v. St. Anton Building, LP et al.
Plaintiff: Krystle Englehart and John Kerr
Defendant: St. Anton Building, LP and St. Anton Multifamily Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00414
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/1/2017 MODIFYING the Pretrial Scheduling Order re Discovery Deadlines; ORDERING that discovery be completed by 6/22/2017; ORDERING that expert discovery be completed by 6/26/2017; ORDERING that no other deadline in this case be impacted by this Order. (Michel, G.)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/31/2017 re 49 Defendant's Notice of Request to Seal: The clerk of court is ordered to redact plaintiff Kerr's date of birth from page 38 of 48 Defendants' disclosure of expert witnesses. Defendants' request to seal is otherwise denied. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/17/2017 ORDERING that the Discovery Deadline is RESET to 5/24/2017 and the Expert Discovery Deadline is RESET to 6/16/2017. (Becknal, R)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/10/2017 ORDERING that the deadline for expert disclosure is EXTENDED to 5/26/2017. (Zignago, K.)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER TO ALLOW IN EXCESS OF TEN (10) DEPOSITIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/13/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/7/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/5/2017. Discovery due by 5/19/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/1/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Trial set for 9/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kaminski, H)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/1/2017 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order is MODIFIED to change the last day to disclose experts and produce reports from 2/24/2017 to 6/8/2017. (Jackson, T)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/21/16 ORDERING that the First Amended Third Party Complaint and all claims asserted therein are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. (Kastilahn, A)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/8/2016 ORDERING TKEC's 21 Motion to Dismiss SAB's first, second, third, fourth, fifth, and sixth causes of action be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED; and TKEC's m otion to dismiss SAMM's second and third causes of action be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. SAB and SAMM have 20 days from the date this Order is signed to file a second amended complaint, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Jackson, T)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/9/16 ORDERING that Third-Party Defendant TKE shall have an additional 14 days up to and including June 27, 2016 to respond to Third-Party Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Englehart et al. v. St. Anton Building, LP et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystle Englehart
Represented By: Eliezer Moshe Cohen
Represented By: Ognian Anguelov Gavrilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kerr
Represented By: Eliezer Moshe Cohen
Represented By: Ognian Anguelov Gavrilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anton Building, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anton Multifamily Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?