Aviation West Charters, LLC v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Aviation West Charters, LLC
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00436
Filed: March 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/15/17 DENYING defendant's 51 Motion for summary judgment, and GRANTING 57 defendant's Motion to strike. This action is REMANDED to the plan administrator for further proceedings consistent with this Order. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER 59 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/1/2017 granting plaintiff leave to file corrected response to 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER 52 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/3/2017 resetting hearing on 51 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment to 11/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/23/2017 ORDERING 44 Plaintiff's ex parte application to seal Exhibit PX041, located at Docket No. 40-5, is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall submit a version of PX041 with M.M.'s name redacted within seven days from the date this Order is signed. (Reader, L)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/18/2017 GRANTING 40 Plaintiff's MOTION to File a Surreply. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/6/2017 GRANTING 25 Stipulation. The 23 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing is CONTINUED to 8/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Trial are TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.(Donati, J)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/31/2016 APPROVING the parties stipulation to withdraw defendant's 7 motion to dismiss and to extend time for defendant's response to the first amended complaint. The 9/19/2016 hearing for the motion to dismiss is taken off calendar. Defenant shall have until 9/15/2016 to answer or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviation West Charters, LLC v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviation West Charters, LLC
Represented By: Kirk J. Wolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?