Van den Heuvel v. Expedia Travel et al
Plaintiff: Jean Marc Van den Heuvel
Defendant: Expedia Travel and British Airways
Case Number: 2:2016cv00567
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2017 ADOPTING 70 Findings and Recommendations in full. Defendant's 63 Motion to Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED and the case is CLOSED. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/6/17, RECOMMENDING that Defendant's 63 motion to compel arbitration be GRANTED, this case be DISMISSED and CLOSED. Within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. Matter REFERRED to District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/12/17 ORDERING plaintiff shall respond to defendant's motion or file a statement of non-opposition by October 25, 2017. Defendant's reply brief is due November 1, 2017. Plaintiff's failure to file a statement of opposition or non-opposition on or before October 25, 2017 will be construed as his non-opposition to defendant's motion. (Becknal, R)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/27/17 ORDERING that the 10/25/17 hearing on Defendant's MOTION to COMPEL 65 is VACATED; and Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's MOTION or file a statement of non-opposition by 10/11/2017. Defendant's Reply Brief is due 10/18/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/12/2017 ORDERING each party to submit proposed case schedules within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G.)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING 48 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/03/17 ORDERING that defendant's 36 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/12/2017 DENYING 49 Motion to Stay. (Zignago, K.)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/1/2017 RECOMMENDING that Defendant's 36 motion to dismiss be denied. Motion referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Zignago, K.)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/28/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 22 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. (Benson, A)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/10/2016 ORDERING the Order to Show Cause 33 is DISCHARGED; the hearing on 36 Expedia's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is CONTINUTED to 12/14/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; Opposition or a Statement of Non-Opposition due by 11/30/2016; and Defendant shall file its Reply, if any, no later than 12/7/2016.(Reader, L)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/1/2016 ORDERING the status conference currently scheduled for 9/7/2016 is VACATED and Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 9/7/2016, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to respond to this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Jackson, T)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/25/2016 ORDERING pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the FRCP, the Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Defendant British Airways, PLC ONLY (and not as to Defendant Expedia, which shall remain as a defendant in the case), with each side to bear its own respective attorneys' fees and costs. (Jackson, T)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/27/16 ORDERING that BA's MOTION to DISMISS 19 is GRANTED. The amended complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to amend his complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/18/2016 ORDERING that defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with leave to amend. The complaint is DISMISSED under Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, and plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's 9 Motion To Proceed to Discovery & Jury Trial is DENIED as moot. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van den Heuvel v. Expedia Travel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Travel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways
Represented By: Peter Michael Hart
Represented By: Matthew J. Ruggles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Marc Van den Heuvel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?