Harris v. Kennedy et al

Plaintiff: David D. Harris
Defendant: N. Kennedy and Carisle
Case Number: 2:2016cv00588
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/17/18. It is hereby ORDERED that the above matter is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and the clerk of this Court is directed to close this matter. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/30/18 ORDERING that within fifteen days of the filed date of this order, each party shall file a statement informing the court whether the undersigned magistrate judge or a different magistrate judge should preside over the settlement conference. (Plummer, M)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/13/2018 ADOPTING in FULL 58 Findings and Recommendations; 36 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTING as to defendant Carlisle and DENYING as to defendant Kennedy; and This case is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings.(Washington, S)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/12/2018 DENYING 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel and DENYING 63 Motion to Strike as moot. (Fabillaran, J)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/09/18 ORDERING the clerk of the court is directed to assign a District Judge to this case. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this cas e. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 36 be granted as to defendant Carlisle and denied as to defendant Kennedy. Motion for Summary Judgment 36 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/29/17 DENYING 44 , 51 motions for delivery of his legal property. The court expects the prison to deliver plaintiffs legal property to him forthwith. If plaintiff experiences unreasonable dela y in the delivery of his property, he may seek court assistance. Within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended opposition to his motion for summary judgment. If plaintiff is not provided access to his legal materials p rior to that deadline, plaintiff may seek an extension of time. Plaintiffs motion to stay this case 47 is denied as moot. Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel 50 is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to change plaintiffs mailing address to: California Medical Facility, P.O. Box 2000, Vacaville, CA 95696. Plaintiff is warned that he must notify the court whenever he is transferred to a new facility by filing a Notice of Change of Address. (Plummer, M)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/16/2017 ORDERING, within 20 days, defendants shall: (a) Inform the court whether it is possible for plaintiff to be provided his legal materials while he is incarcerated at CHCF; and (b) Respo nd to plaintiff's request for a copy of the CDCR 7219 "medical unusual occurrence form". Plaintiff's 41 request that defendants' counsel provide him copies of the documents used during his deposition is DENIED for the reasons stated in the court's order signed 8/8/2017. (Yin, K)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 08/08/17 denying 37 plaintiff's discovery motion. (Plummer, M)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/1/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's Motion for Discovery (ECF No. 28 ) filed November 15, 2016, is DENIED without prejudice; and defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time (ECF No. 34 ) is GRANTED. The discovery and pretrial motions deadlines in the November 21, 2016 Discovery and Scheduling Order are continued. Discovery, including any motions to compel discovery, shall be completed by May 9, 2017. All other pretrial motions shall be filed by August 4, 2017. In all other respects, the Discovery and Scheduling Order remains the same.(Dillon, M)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/11/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's 14 Motion for TRO, 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. (Benson, A)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/22/2016 ORDERING The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff one USM-285 form, along with an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed 3/21/2016; Within 60 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete and submit the Notice of Submission of Documents to the court. (Reader, L)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/9/2016 ORDERING within 14 days, Supervising Deputy AG Monica Anderson shall address plaintiff's 14 motion for injunctive relief; and the Clerk shall serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's 9/7/2016 motion for temporary restraining order on Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) (Yin, K)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of David D. Harris signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/23/16. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?