McCoy v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Petitioner: Aaron McCoy
Respondent: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00642
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/20/2017 GRANTING respondent's 13 motion to dismiss; this action is DISMISSED without prejudice; and the court declines to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/23/16 ORDERING that 10 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and the response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus shall be filed on or before July 21, 2016.(Dillon, M)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/04/16 ordering petitioner shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court shall send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aaron McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?