Patterson v. Valenzuela
Petitioner: Genaro Brandell Patterson
Respondent: Elvin Valenzuela
Case Number: 2:2016cv00654
Filed: March 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/6/2021 ADOPTING 20 The Findings and Recommendations in full; Petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED; and The court DECLINES to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/18/20 ORDERING the Clerk of Court randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 30 days.(Plummer, M)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/1/16 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of time. Respondent shall have an additional 7 days, to and including July 12, 2016, to file a responsive brief to Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Genaro Brandell Patterson
Represented By: James W. Whitehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elvin Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?