Felix v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bridgett Jane Marie Felix
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00698
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/18/17, DENYING Plaintiff's 13 motion for summary judgment. The Commissioner's 18 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the Commissioner's favor. CASE CLOSED(Kastilahn, A)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/16 ORDERING that Defendant shall have an extension of time of an additional 14 days to respond to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. The new due date will be November 28, 2016.(Becknal, R)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/12/2016 ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to file a response to the 13 Motion for Summary Judgment by 11/14/2016. (Michel, G.)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/06/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk is directed to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal an original and 5 copies of the completed summons, 5 copies of the complaint, and 5 copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgett Jane Marie Felix
Represented By: Langley Ellen Kreuze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?