Mason v. City of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Jewel Mason
Defendant: City of Sacramento, Elsie Fong and Mike Malone
Case Number: 2:2016cv00744
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/18/17 ORDERING good cause appearing therefore, the Court hereby orders the DISMISSAL of the entire action with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/30/17: Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial RESET for 4/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/04/17 ORDERING that the Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 9/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez and the Jury Trial is RESET for 10/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/10/2017 ORDERING Pursuant to Local Rule 271 (Fed. R. Civ.P.16), the parties are REFERRED to the VoluntaryDispute Resolution Program. (Reader, L)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/16 ORDERING that all dispositive motions shall be filed by 6/27/2017. Hearing on such motions shall be on 7/25/2017 at 1:30 p.m. All discovery shall be completed by 5/19/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/17/2017 and disclosure of any rebuttal experts due by 3/31/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/1/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial is set for 10/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. City of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Kathleen T Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsie Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jewel Mason
Represented By: Ralph Cole Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?