A.C. et al v. City of Fairfield et al
Plaintiff: A.C., I.C., Guadalupe Villa-Vargas, Arturo Ceja-Gonzalez, W.C., J.C., Pablo Ceja and Leticia Ceja
Defendant: City of Fairfield, Joe Griego, Daniel Hatzell and Clinton Morgan
Case Number: 2:2016cv00746
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/18/18 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice; and the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/24/18 ORDERING that, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiffs shall show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Failure to show cause will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Becknal, R)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/13/2018 GRANTING 30 Motion to Withdraw. (Hunt, G)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/2/2018 GRANTING 31 Notice of Request to Seal Document. The Court GRANTS Counsel permission to file Declaration of Melissa Nold in Support of Motion to Withdraw under seal. (Zignago, K.)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/14/17. The Court ORDERS the matter STAYED for 90 days from the date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 07/10/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 24 Stipulation, the close of fact discovery is EXTENDED to 11/27/17 and the close of expert discovery is EXTENDED to 01/08/18. (Benson, A)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/9/2017 ORDERING 22 Pursuant to the parties stipulation, and Good cause having been shown, the Court PERMITS parties joint Protective Order. (Reader, L)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/11/2016 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 12 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING the plaintiffs twenty days to file a Second Amended Complaint; in the event a Second Amended Complaint is not filed, ORDERING the defendants to file their answers to the 7 First Amended Complaint within thirty days. (Michel, G.)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/8/16 ORDERING that the deadline to submit a joint status report now set for June 10, 2016 is continued by 30 days to July 8, 2016. (Becknal, R)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 05/25/16 ORDERING that the 8 Request to Seal is GRANTED; the second attachment to the 7 Amended Complaint is SEALED. (Benson, A)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/12/16 ORDERING that Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file a First Amended Complaint, including Successor-in-Interest Declarations, within 14 days of this Order. Defendant will file an a responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint within 20 days of Plaintiffs filing the First Amended Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.C. et al v. City of Fairfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.C.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Villa-Vargas
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Ceja-Gonzalez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.C.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pablo Ceja
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Ceja
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Lateef Gray
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Griego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hatzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?