Rosales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Faith Marie Anaya Rosales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00761
Filed: April 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/21/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff is awarded attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) in the amount of $7,000.00. (Zignago, K.)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/19/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 17 is GRANTED; Defendant's cross motion for summary judgment 26 is DENIED; this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order; and the Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/24/2017 DEEMING the 29 Reply timely. (Michel, G.)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/26/17 ORDERING that the due date for defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 04/24/17. (Benson, A)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/1/2017 ORDERING that the new due date for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is 3/24/2017. (Zignago, K.)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/03/17 ORDERING that the time for defendant to file her Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 2/22/2017. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/10/2017 ORDERING that the new due date for Defendant's responsive brief and opposition to Plaintiff's brief WILL BE 1/23/2017. (Jackson, T)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/27/2016 ORDERING that Plaintiff file Motion for Summary judgment by 11/7/2016. (Butolph, J)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/11/16 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to issue process. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Marie Anaya Rosales
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?