Zolensky II v. American Medflight, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Zolensky II
Defendant: American Medflight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00788
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/2017 ORDERING the parties to show cause, in writing, within seven days, why dispositional documents have not been filed; CAUTIONING all parties that a failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Michel, G.)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/21/2017 ORDERING Discovery due by 8/11/2017; Dispositive Motions filed by 10/6/2017; Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by 12/28/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; the parties are ORDERED to conduct a Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman by 7/27/2017. (Reader, L)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/17/17 ORDERING that Defendant's 28 motion to compel is GRANTED (see order for details). The court DECLINES to address the parties' additional issue relating to whether defendant has waived the attorney-client privilege and/or work product protection with regard to certain documents it is withholding on those bases because that issue is not ripe at this juncture. The court DECLINES to modify the pretrial schedule at this time.(Kastilahn, A)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/3/17: Plaintiff may appear telephonically at the hearing on discovery disputes scheduled for April 13, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 25. (Kaminski, H)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/24/2017 GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss WITH LEAVE to AMEND. (Washington, S)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/26/17 ORDERING that defendant's 21 Motion for Protective Order to Extend Time is GRANTED; defendant shall fully respond to plaintiff's outstanding requests for production of documents by 02/24/17; no further extensions of time will be granted; discovery deadline EXTENDED to 5/14/2017. (Benson, A)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/4/16: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/3/2017. Discovery due by 1/13/2017. Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 5/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Jury Trial set for 10/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/11/16 ORDERING counsel for defendant American Medflight, Inc. is hereby ORDERED, within seven (7) days of entry of this order, to show cause why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for his failure to comply with this court's order. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zolensky II v. American Medflight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Zolensky II
Represented By: Anthony John Zaller, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medflight, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Lucas Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?