Samaan v. Jones, et al.
Plaintiff: Nabil Samaan
Defendant: Scott R. Jones and County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2016cv00789
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/23/19 DISMISSING this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and VACATING the trial date. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/1/19 DIRECTING plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within 7 days why this case should not be dismissed for lack of standing to seek injunctive relief as plaintiff has already obtained the relief sought in this manner by virtue of obtaining a CCW permit from the Placer County Sheriff. (Coll, A)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/04/19 GRANTING 76 Motion in Limine to strike plaintiff Nabil Samaan's jury demand and DECLINES to empanel an advisory jury in this case. (Benson, A.)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/9/2018 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller with the filing of a joint pretrial statement due 10/26/2018. (Zignago, K.)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/10/2018 ORDERING that the Pretrial Conference is RESET to 7/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; and the Joint Pretrial Statement is EXTENDED to 6/22/2018. (Reader, L)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/30/3017 ORDERING 46 Plaintiff's Motion to file a second amended complaint is DENIED. (Reader, L)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 08/28/17 ORDERING that Samaan's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/31/17: The hearing date of April 19, 2017 on defendants' motion for protective order is vacated. The deposition of plaintiff Nabil Samaan s hall take place at the federal courthouse on April 12, 2017, commencing at 10:00 a.m. The deposition of James Sullivan shall take place at the federal courthouse on April 13, 2017, commencing at 10:00 a.m. The deposition of Matt Obregon shall take place at the federal courthouse on April 13, 2017, commencing at 11:30 a.m. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samaan v. Jones, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabil Samaan
Represented By: Nabil Samaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?