Cortes v. National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Mike Cortes
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00823
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/4/2020 GRANTING 58 Motion for Attorney Fees and AWARDING $1,019,475.13 in attorney's fees for Bursor & Fisher, P.A., AWARDING Plaintiff Mike Cortes $2,000 as a service awa rd for his participation in this matter, and AWARDING $17,658.93 to Bursor & Fisher, P.A. as reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses in connection with the prosecution of this matter. Defendant shall pay the above attorney's fees, expenses, and service award pursuant to and in the manner provided by the terms of the Settlement Agreement. (Huang, H)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/6/2020 GRANTING 49 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Court hereby certifies the Settlement Class preliminarily and solely for purposes of the se ttlement. The Court hereby appoints Plaintiff as Class Representative and Burton & Fisher P.A. as Class Counsel. The Court hereby APPOINTS R/G2 Claims Administration, LLC as the Claims Administrator pursuant to the Agreement. The Court hereby APPROVE S the proposed notice plan as set forth above and in the Agreement. The Claims Administrator shall within 14 days following the entry of this Order activate the settlement website and provide direct notice to the Settlement Class members in accordance with the Agreement. The Court reserves the right to continue the date of the final approval hearing without further notice to class members. (Reader, L)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/20/2019 EXTENDING deadline to file dispositional papers to 8/23/2019. (Zignago, K.)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/18/19 EXTENDING deadline to file dispositional papers pursuant to Local Rule 160 to August 9, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/03/19 EXTENDING the date to submit dispositional documents to 08/09/19. (Benson, A.)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/4/2019 EXTENDING Time to 6/28/2019, for the Parties to File Dispositional Papers. (York, M)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/6/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED that all deadlines, hearings, and pending motions concerning this matter are VACATED as MOOT. 23 , 29 In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents are to be filed no later than 2/28/2019. Failure to file dispositional papers on this date may be grounds for sanctions. (Reader, L)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/3/2018 GRANTING 15 Motion for Approval of Notice Plan. Within 7 days of electronic filing of this Order, Plaintiff shall cause a copy of the Post-Card notice to be sent by regular mail to all Class Members for whom CEG has identified mailing addresses. The deadline for Class Members to request exclusion from the Class shall be 60 days from the date that class notice is disseminated. Further, the Court hereby modifies 10 Order granti ng Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to liability and holds that judgment in abeyance for the duration of the 60-day notice period. Lastly, the Court hereby modifies its 10 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (Washington, S)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.on 8/2/2017 GRANTING 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Class Certification; and Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED; with respect to TCPA liability; this Court HOLDS in ABEYANCE the issue of damages until after discovery has been conducted; the Court retains jurisdiction over this matter to assess damages and supplement this judgment with the appropriate damages amount at a later date, upon motion from Pla intiff; Plaintiff is further ORDERED to file a status report every 60 days from the date of electronic filing of this order, updating the Court as to the status of the case and the composition of the class. (Reader, L) Modified on 8/2/2017 (Reader, L).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes v. National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Cortes
Represented By: Yeremey Olegovich Krivoshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?