Hawkins et al. v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Charles Hawkins and Odesser H Hawkins
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00827
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/27/17, ORDERING that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party will bear its own attorneys fees and costs associated with this case. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/3/17 ORDERING pursuant to the terms of the foregoing stipulation, and good cause appearing, Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s deadline to file its Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended from 2/28/17 to 3/9/17. (Becknal, R)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/22/17: The Court extends the fact discovery deadline 60-days: from March 6, 2017 to May 5, 2017. All other related deadlines in the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order will be based on this extended date. (Kaminski, H)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/13/2017 DENYING Defendant SPS's 8 Motion to Dismiss. (Jackson, T)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/4/2016 ORDERING Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s response to Plaintiffs' complaint is due by 5/5/2016. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins et al. v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hawkins
Represented By: Andrey R. Yurtsan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odesser H Hawkins
Represented By: Andrey R. Yurtsan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan L. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?