PHH Mortgage Corporation v. Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP et al
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss LLP, Robert E Weiss, Cris A. Klingerman, Brian Engel, James C. Frappier and Steve P. Turner
Respondent: Edward A. Treder
Case Number: 2:2016cv00832
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yuba
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/6/2017 ORDERING that the court OVERRULES defendants' objections to the proffer material filed as ECF Nos. 67 at 1-5 and 67-2 and 67-3, as these documents are relevant to the agreement and its potential applicability in this matter. The court will not consider portions of plaintiff's proffer unrelated to counsel's representations at the 10/20/2017 hearing. The court therefore SUSTAINS defendant's objections with r espect to proffer material regarding the Texas statute of limitations, ECF Nos. 67 at 5:12-7:9 and 67-1. Defendant is entitled to respond. Defendant's response, limited to ten pages, is due seven days after this order is issued, and should ad dress, at a minimum, (1) whether the Legal Services Agreement(s) governed the parties' relationship from the inception of Linza, and (2) if so, whether the New Jersey statute of limitations for legal malpractice governs this action. (Zignago, K.)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDMENT TO SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/17/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 58 Stipulation, the Court PARTIALLY MODIFIES the scheduling conference as follows: Hearing on Dispositive Motions: 10/20/17 at 10: 00 a.m.; Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due 03/02/18; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The due dates for trial and trial briefs are now VACATED, and will be determined at the final pre-trial conference. (Benson, A)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SECOND AMENDMENT TO THE SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/18/2017 ORDERING completion of expert discovery CONTINUED to 6/26/2017; Hearing on dispositive motions CONTINUED to 8/11/2017; filing of final pretrial conference statement CONTINUED to 10/27/2017; Final pretrial conference CONTINUED to 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM; filing date for trial briefs CONTINUED to 12/18/2017; Trial CONTINUED to 1/2/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Zignago, K.)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/1/17 ORDERING that the deadline for the disclosure of expert witnesses is EXTENDED to 4/7/2017. The deadline for the disclosure of supplemental expert witnesses is EXTENDED to 4/27/2017. The deadline for expert discovery is EXTENDED to 5/25/2017. The deadline for dispositive motions is EXTENDED to 6/30/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/26/2016. (Michel, G.)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of California, re 27 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(3). Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/20/2016. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)[Transferred from cand on 4/22/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHH Mortgage Corporation v. Barrett, Daffin, Frappier, Treder & Weiss, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Loren Kieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss LLP
Represented By: Bret Batchman
Represented By: Daniel Kohls
Represented By: Daniel V Kohls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cris A. Klingerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Frappier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve P. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edward A. Treder
Represented By: Bret Batchman
Represented By: Daniel V Kohls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?