Mendoza v. Spadaro et al.
Plaintiff: Toribio Mendoza
Defendant: Spadaro and Boyt
Case Number: 2:2016cv00855
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/30/2018. The findings and recommendations filed June 6, 2018, are ADOPTED to the extent consistent with this order; Defendant Spadaros motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 42 ) is GRANTED; and this case is CLOSED.(Andrews, P)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/19/18 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 6/4/18 51 are ADOPTED in full; and All defendants and claims other than a claim arising under the Eighth Amendment against defendant Spadaro are DISMISSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/6/2018 RECOMMENDING 42 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted, defendant Spadaro be dismissed from this action, and this case be closed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/4/2018 VACATING the court's 5/11/2016 order 8 that all defendants other than defendants Spadaro and Boyt be dismissed, and VACATING the court's 12/5 /2016 order 37 that defendant Boyt be dismissed. IT IS RECOMMENDED all defendants and claims other than a claim arising under the Eighth Amendment against defendant Spadaro be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/17/17 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/5/2016 DISMISSING defendant Boyt from this action without prejudice.(Yin, K)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/28/2016 DENYING plaintiff's requests in the 10/24/2016 document 30 . (Yin, K)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/09/16 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff 1 copy of the complaint filed by plaintiff on 4/25/16. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the 3 copies of the complaint required to effect service. (Plummer, M)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/10/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Toribio Mendoza and forward payment to the court until the balance i s paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/16 DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Spadaro et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toribio Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spadaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?