Jones v. Sutter Solano Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Bobby L. Jones
Defendant: Sutter Solano Medical Center and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00858
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER dismissing defendant Sutter Solano Medical Center 27 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/13/2017. All parties shall bear their own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER 21 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/31/2017 extending deadlines as follows: Motions to be filed by 8/31/2017; Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 11/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; Bench Trial is reset for 1/17/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/7/2016 GRANTING 17 defendants' counsel's request to appear by telephone at the 10/11/2016 Scheduling Conference at 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/31/16 ORDERING that the deadline for all Defendants to respond to the Complaint shall be extended as such that a responsive pleading filed on or before September 23, 2016 shall be deemed timely.(Dillon, M)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER 6 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/9/2016 ordering as follows: 1) The deadline for all defendants to respond to the Complaint shall be extended such that a responsive pleading filed on or before 9/2/2016 shall b e deemed timely; and 2) The Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for 8/29/2016 shall be continued to 10/11/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 9/27/2016. All deadlines related to the Conference shall be continued accordingly. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Sutter Solano Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby L. Jones
Represented By: Jesse Landis Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Solano Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?