Caliguire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jerry A. Caliguire
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv00872
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/25/17 DENYING plaintiff's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING the Commissioner's 22 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; the final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED, and judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/26/2017 ORDERING that the new due date for Defendant's motion for summary judgment is 2/2/2017. (Zignago, K.)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/16/16 ORDERING the new due date for Defendant's responsive brief and opposition to Plaintiff's brief will be Thursday, January 19, 2017.(Becknal, R)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/2/16 ORDERING that the Plaintiff is granted an extension of time until November 4, 2016 to file a motion for summary judgment, with all other dates in the Court's Order extended accordingly.(Becknal, R)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/4/2016 ORDERING that time is EXTENDED by 28 days from 9/29/2016 to 10/28/2016 for Plaintiff to file a motion for summary judgment, with all other dates in the Court's Order Concerning Review Of Social Security Cases extended accordingly. (Jackson, T)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/16. The Clerk is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal (USM). Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the required documents for service, and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caliguire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry A. Caliguire
Represented By: Vijay Jagdish Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?