Fonseca v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, et al.
Plaintiff: Jonee Fonseca
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, Michael Myette and Karen Smith
Case Number: 2:2016cv00889
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 8, 2017, Re: Deft's Motion to Dismiss, before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Cathie Bodene, Phone number 916-446-6360 E-mail cbodene@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter Cathie Bodene or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018. (Bodene, C)
November 16, 2017 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jonee Fonseca for proceedings held on 9/8/17 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Cathie Bodene. (McReynolds, Matthew)
November 1, 2017 Filing 92 USCA CASE NUMBER 17-17153 for #90 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonee Fonseca. (Zignago, K.)
October 20, 2017 Filing 91 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #90 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonee Fonseca. Notice of Appeal filed *10/19/2017*, Complaint filed *4/28/2016* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *9/25/2017*. Court Reporter: *Jennifer Coulthard*. *Fee Status: Paid on 10/19/2017 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Kaminski, H)
October 19, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE of APPEAL by Jonee Fonseca as to #89 Judgment, #88 Order. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-7320712) (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Snider, Kevin) Modified on 10/20/2017 (Kaminski, H).
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JUDGMENT dated *09/25/17* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/22/17. (Benson, A.)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/22/17 GRANTING defendants' #83 Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
September 8, 2017 Filing 87 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/8/2017. Attorneys, Kevin Snider, Matthew McReynolds, and Alexandra Snyder, present for plaintiff. Attorney, Ashante Norton, present for defendant Karen Smith. After hearing oral argument, the court took Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #83 ) under submission; a formal written order to issue. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 7, 2017 Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #83 ) set for 8/11/2017 is VACATED and RESET for 9/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 4, 2017 Filing 85 REPLY by Karen Smith re #84 Opposition to Motion, #83 Motion to Dismiss. (Norton, Ashante)
July 27, 2017 Filing 84 OPPOSITION by Jonee Fonseca to #83 Motion to Dismiss. (Snider, Kevin)
May 19, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION to DISMISS by Karen Smith. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Norton, Ashante)
May 1, 2017 Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court GRANTS the parties' stipulation (ECF #81 ) to extend defendant Smith's May 5, 2017 deadline to respond to the third amended complaint (ECF #80 ). Defendant's response shall be filed by May 19, 2017. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
April 27, 2017 Filing 81 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time To Respond To 3AC re #80 Amended Complaint by Karen Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Norton, Ashante)
April 14, 2017 Filing 80 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Karen Smith by Jonee Fonseca.(Snider, Kevin)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/27/17 ORDERING that defendant's #68 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; plaintiff is GRANTED 21 days LEAVE TO AMEND. (Benson, A)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/14/2016 ORDERING that initial disclosures as required by F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a) be completed within fourteen (14) days of the Scheduling Conference; ORDERING that all discovery be completed by 10/31/2017; ORDERING all counsel to designate experts by 9/8/2017 and to submit a supplemental list of expert witnesses by 9/29/2017; ORDERING that all expert discovery be completed by 10/31/2017; ORDERING that all dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, be heard by 1/12/2018; SETTING the Final Pretrial Conference for 4/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING the parties to confer and file a joint pretrial conference statement by 3/30/2018; SETTING Trial for 6/4/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that trial briefs be submitted by 5/21/2018; CAUTIONING all parties that this Status Order will become final without further order of the court unless objections are filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. (Michel, G.)
October 7, 2016 Filing 77 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/7/2016. Attorney, Kevin Snider, present for Plaintiffs. Attorney, Ashante Norton, present for Defendant Karen Smith. After hearing oral argument as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 68]), the court took the matter under submission. Although the matter was also on calendar for a scheduling conference, the court deferred scheduling. A formal written order will issue. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 4, 2016 Filing 76 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Jonee Fonseca to #74 Objections to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice. (Snider, Kevin) Modified on 10/4/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
October 4, 2016 Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the lengthy calendar on 10/7/2016 and to ensure sufficient time for all matters, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #68 ) and Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 AM is RESET on the same date for 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
September 30, 2016 Filing 74 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Karen Smith to #71 Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Norton, Ashante)
September 30, 2016 Filing 73 REPLY by Karen Smith to RESPONSE to #68 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Norton, Ashante)
September 29, 2016 Filing 72 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jonee Fonseca. (Snider, Kevin)
September 23, 2016 Filing 71 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Jonee Fonseca in re #70 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Snider, Kevin)
September 23, 2016 Filing 70 OPPOSITION by Jonee Fonseca to #68 MOTION to DISMISS. (Snider, Kevin)
September 1, 2016 Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/13/2016 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 10/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
August 31, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION to DISMISS by Karen Smith. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities [Memorandum of], #2 Notice [Request for Judicial], #3 Exhibit A-E to Request for Judicial Notice)(Norton, Ashante)
July 21, 2016 Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the Order at ECF No. #66 extending the time for defendant Karen Smith to respond to the Second Amended Complaint and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 9/1/2016 is VACATED and RESET for 10/13/2016 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/19/2016 ORDERING Defendant Karen Smith to respond to the #64 Second Amended Complaint by 8/31/2016. (Michel, G.)
July 14, 2016 Filing 65 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time to Respond to the #64 Second Amended Complaint by Karen Smith. (Norton, Ashante)
July 1, 2016 Filing 64 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Karen Smith by Jonee Fonseca.(Snider, Kevin)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/22/16 ordering that defendant Smith's time to serve and file a response to plaintiff's amended complaint for declaratory relief in the above entitled action be extended from 6/21/16 to 7/05/16 pursuant to Local Rule 144(a). (Plummer, M)
June 20, 2016 Filing 62 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Extending Time to Respond to The Amended Complaint #29 by Karen Smith. (Norton, Ashante) Modified on 6/21/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 8, 2016 Filing 61 USCA CASE NUMBER 16-15883 for #49 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Jonee Fonseca. (Zignago, K.)
June 8, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jonee Fonseca. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Dismissal of Kaiser & Dr. Myette)(Snider, Kevin)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/2/2016 ORDERING that Defendants' last day to file their responses to the Amended complaint is EXTENDED to 6/12/2016. (Donati, J)
June 1, 2016 Filing 57 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to extend time for filing responsive pleading by Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, Michael Myette. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Drexwell) Modified on 6/2/2016 (Washington, S).
June 1, 2016 Filing 56 STIPULATION to extend Time to Respond to The Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Karen Smith. (Norton, Ashante) Modified on 6/2/2016 (Washington, S).
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER of USCA as to #49 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Jonee Fonseca, ORDEIRNG that Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This order shall act as and for the mandate of the Court. (Kastilahn, A)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER of USCA as to #49 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Jonee Fonseca. The dissolution of the district courts temporary restraining order is stayed temporarily in order to provide this court sufficient time to review the motion papers and decide the emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal. (Washington, S)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/19/16 ORDERING that the time for defendants to respond to the Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 06/02/16. (Benson, A)
May 19, 2016 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of motion for preliminary injunction held on May 11, 2016, before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart, Phone number 916-446-1347 E-mail kswinhartcsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 6/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016. (Swinhart, K)
May 18, 2016 Filing 52 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading by Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, Michael Myette. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Drexwell)
May 17, 2016 Filing 51 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jonee Fonseca served on 5/17/2016, answer due 6/7/2016. (Snider, Kevin)
May 17, 2016 Filing 50 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #49 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Jonee Fonseca. Notice of Appeal filed *5/14/2016*, Complaint filed *4/28/2016* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *5/13/2016*. Court Reporter: *Kathy Swinhart*. *Fee Status: Paid on 5/14/2016 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Reader, L)
May 14, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Jonee Fonseca as to #48 Order,. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0972-6468966) (Attachments: #1 Notice Statement of Issues)(Snider, Kevin)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/13/16 ORDERING the temporary restraining order currently in effect REMAINS IN PLACE until the close of business on Friday, May 20, 2016, at which point it will be dissolved. The motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. This order resolves ECF Nos. #31 & #33 . (Becknal, R)
May 13, 2016 Filing 47 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #46 by Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville for proceedings held on May 11, 2016 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart. (Curliano, Jason)
May 12, 2016 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville for proceedings held on May 11, 2016 before Judge Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Kathy Swinhart. (Curliano, Jason)
May 11, 2016 Filing 45 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on May 11, 2016. Attorney, Kevin Snider, Matthew McReynolds, and Alexandra Snyder, present for plaintiff. Plaintiff, Jonee Fonseca, present. Attorney, Jason Curliano, present for defendants Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville and Michael Myette. Attorney, Ashante Norton and Ismael Castro, present for Karen Smith. After hearing oral argument as to plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #33 ), the court took the matter under submission. A formal written order will issue. Court Reporter: Kathy Swinhart. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/10/16 ORDERING Attorney Walter E Dellinger ADDED for Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville. (Jackson, T)
May 10, 2016 Filing 43 OPPOSITION by Defendant Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville to #33 Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Michael S. Myette, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Curliano, Jason) (Docket Text Modified on 5/10/2016 by C. Schultz)
May 10, 2016 PAYMENT for Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $ 200, receipt number 0972-6461081. (Curliano, Jason)
May 10, 2016 Filing 42 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: CONTINUED INFORMAL CONFERENCE CALL re further settlement discussions held on 5/10/2016. No additional progress made. Plaintiffs Counsel Alexandra Snyder present. Defendants Counsel Jason Curliano present. (Owen, K)
May 9, 2016 Filing 41 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice of Walter Dellinger, Proposed Order by Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville. (Curliano, Jason) Modified on 5/10/2016 (Becknal, R).
May 9, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ashante Latrice Norton on behalf of Karen Smith. Attorney Norton, Ashante Latrice added. (Norton, Ashante)
May 9, 2016 Filing 39 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: INFORMAL CONFERENCE CALL held on 5/9/2016 re further settlement discussions. Court set a further informal conference call for 5/10/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Parties are instructed to connect to the call using the same dial-in information previously provided. Plaintiffs Counsel Alexandra Snyder present. Defendants Counsel Jason Curliano present. (Owen, K)
May 8, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE of personal service by of Alexandra Snyder. (Snyder, Alexandra) Modified on 5/9/2016 (Becknal, R).
May 6, 2016 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Alan Shewmon, MD. (Snyder, Alexandra)
May 6, 2016 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Dr. Paul Byrne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brain Death Guidelines for Children)(Snyder, Alexandra)
May 6, 2016 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Jonee Fonseca. (Snyder, Alexandra)
May 6, 2016 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Alexandra Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Article, #2 Exhibit Author CV)(Snyder, Alexandra)
May 6, 2016 Filing 33 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to supersede TRO with Preliminary Injunction)(Snider, Kevin) Modified on 5/9/2016 (Becknal, R).
May 6, 2016 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Jonee Fonseca re video recording. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Snyder, Alexandra) Modified on 5/9/2016 (Becknal, R).
May 5, 2016 Filing 31 PETITION for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem by Jonee Fonseca. Attorney Snyder, Alexandra M. added. (Snyder, Alexandra)
May 4, 2016 Filing 30 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Karen Smith* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin Trent Snider* *Pacific Justice Institute* *P.O. Box 276600* *Sacramento, CA 95827*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 3, 2016 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Karen Smith by Jonee Fonseca.(Snider, Kevin)
May 3, 2016 Filing 28 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/3/2016. After negotiations, CASE NOT SETTLED. The Court set a follow-up informal conference call for 5/9/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Parties are instructed to use the following to access the conference call: 877-848-7030 (dial), 7431521 (access code). Plaintiffs Counsel Alexandra Snider, Seth Kraus present. Defendants Counsel Jason Curliano present. (Owen, K)
May 3, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement by Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, Michael Myette. (Jones, Drexwell) Modified on 5/4/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 3, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Drexwell M. Jones on behalf of Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, Michael Myette. Attorney Jones, Drexwell M. added. (Jones, Drexwell)
May 3, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement by Jonee Fonseca. (Snider, Kevin)
May 3, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kevin Trent Snider on behalf of Jonee Fonseca. (Snider, Kevin)
May 2, 2016 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING a Settlement Conference SET for May 3, 2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. As soon as practical, the parties are directed to submit confidential statements, not to exceed five pages, to Magistrate Judge Delaney's chambers using the following email address: ckdorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Such statements are neither to be filed with the Clerk nor served on opposing counsel; however, each party shall e-file a one page document entitled Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement. Each party is reminded of the requirement that it be represented in person at the settlement conference by a person able to dispose of the case or fully authorized to settle the matter at the conference on any terms. See Local Rule 270 (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES for further proceedings as to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on May 2, 2016. Plaintiff's Counsel, Kevin Snider, present. Plaintiff, Jonee Fonseca, present at counsel table. Defendants' Counsel, Jason Curliano, present. Plaintiff was granted until close of business on May 3, 2016 to file an amended complaint. A settlement conference will be set for May 3, 2016 at a time to be determined. The court set a Preliminary Injunction briefing schedule and hearing as follows: Plaintiff's motion shall be filed by noon on May 6, 2016, Defendants' opposition shall be filed by noon on May 10, 2016, and a hearing is set for 5/11/2016 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The briefing is limited to 20 pages each. If a party anticipates presenting evidence/calling witnesses, they should include that information in their briefing and provide estimates for the time needed. The April 28, 2016 Order (ECF No. #9 ) issued by District Judge Troy L. Nunley remains in effect. Court Reporter: Kimberly Bennett. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 2, 2016 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Alexandra Snyder in SUPPORT OF #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 TRO Checklist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Snider, Kevin)
May 2, 2016 Filing 20 REPLY by Jonee Fonseca to Defendants' OPPOSITION to Request for TRO #14 . (Snider, Kevin) Modified on 5/3/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 2, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of proceedings and orders in Superior Court; Declaration of Alexander Snyder re #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Snider, Kevin) Modified on 5/3/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 2, 2016 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Alexandra Snyder in SUPPORT OF #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 TRO Checklist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Snider, Kevin)
May 2, 2016 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Plaintiff shall file a notice before 12:00 p.m. noon today, Monday, May 2, 2016, describing any proceedings or orders in her case before the Placer County Superior Court that occurred after her complaint was filed in this court. The notice shall not exceed five pages. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
May 1, 2016 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Dr. Nash in SUPPORT OF #2 TRO Checklist. (Snider, Kevin)
May 1, 2016 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Dr. Mathews in SUPPORT OF #2 TRO Checklist. (Snider, Kevin)
May 1, 2016 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Defendants Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, Michael Myette to #4 Summons, #3 Declaration. Attorney Curliano, Jason John added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason J. Curliano, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Curliano, Jason) (Docket Text Modified on 5/2/2016 by C. Schultz)
April 29, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Errata by Jonee Fonseca re #3 Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Angela Clemente)(Snider, Kevin)
April 29, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jason John Curliano on behalf of Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville. Attorney Curliano, Jason John added. (Curliano, Jason)
April 29, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Supplemental Evidence and Availability of Plaintiff to Testify by Jonee Fonseca re #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Order. (Snider, Kevin) Modified on 5/2/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 29, 2016 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The hearing set for May 2, 2016 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Troy L. Nunley is RESET on the same date and time before the assigned District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (See LR 122) Plaintiff shall serve a copy of the 4/28/2016 Order, ECF No. #9 , and this Minute Order on opposing counsel. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) (Docket Text Modified on 4/29/2016 by C. Schultz: Adding language re: service.)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/28/16 ORDERING the parties to appear before this Court on MONDAY, MAY 2, 2016 AT 1:30 p.m. for a hearing on this matter. The Court hereby further ORDERS as follows: Defendants shall be restrained from removing ventilation from Plaintiff Israel Stinson; Defendant Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville shall continue to be legally responsible for Plaintiff Israel Stinson's care and treatment; Defendant Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville shall continue to provide cardio-pulmonary support as is currently being provided; Defendant Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville shall provide medications currently administered to Plaintiff Israel Stinson; Defendant Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville shall continue to provide nutrition to Israel in the manner currently provided to the extent possible to maintain Israels stability, given his present condition. These orders shall remain in effect until the conclusion of the hearing on this matter, scheduled for Monday, 5/2/16 at 1:30 p.m. before this Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 28, 2016 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Alexandra Snyder in SUPPORT OF #2 TRO Checklist. (Snider, Kevin)
April 28, 2016 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Jonee Fonseca in SUPPORT of #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Order 1, #2 Superior Court Order 2, #3 Superior Court Order 3, #4 Superior Court Order 4, #5 Stinson Complaint)(Snider, Kevin)
April 28, 2016 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/28/2016: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to immediately submit all Placer County Superior Court of California filings related to the temporary restraining order against Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
April 28, 2016 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 9/1/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Michel, G.)
April 28, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, Michael Myette* with answer to #1 Complaint and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin T. Snider* *PACIFIC JUSTICE INSTITUTE* *P.O. Box 276600* *Sacramento, CA 95827*. (Michel, G.)
April 28, 2016 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Alexandra Snyder in support of #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul A. Bryne, M.D., #2 Declaration of Jonee Fonseca) (Snider, Kevin)
April 28, 2016 Filing 2 TRO CHECKLIST by Jonee Fonseca. (Snider, Kevin)
April 28, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Jonee Fonseca. Attorney Snider, Kevin Trent ADDED. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0972-6442400) (Snider, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fonseca v. Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonee Fonseca
Represented By: Matthew Brown McReynolds
Represented By: Kevin Trent Snider
Represented By: Alexandra M Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Medical Center Roseville
Represented By: Jason John Curliano
Represented By: Walter E Dellinger
Represented By: Drexwell M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Myette
Represented By: Jason John Curliano
Represented By: Drexwell M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Smith
Represented By: Ismael Armendariz Castro
Represented By: Ashante Latrice Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?