Turner v. Riaz et al
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Defendant: N. Riaz, V.M. Duc, Nguyen and J. Macomber
Case Number: 2:2016cv00969
Filed: May 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 11/19/19 ADOPTING in full 67 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 56 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/10/19 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for summary judgment 56 be granted. Motion for Summary Judgement 56 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/14/19 ORDERING the Clerk of Court is directed to indicate on the docket that plaintiffs notice filed June12, 2019 61 ,is not relevant to the instant action but only to Turner v. Byer, Case No. 2 :17-cv-1869 EFB P. Plaintiff is admonished to refrain from filing any further pro se matters in the instant action while he is represented by counsel. In addition to serving plaintiffs counsel with a copy of this order, the Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiff himself at the California Health Care Facility in Stockton.(Plummer, M)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/03/19 as to 56 Motion for Summary Judgement ( Motion Hearing continued to 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire.) (Plummer, M)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/08/19 ORDERING Alexander L. Nowinski is appointed as limited purpose counsel for plaintiff in the above entitled matter. This appointment is for the limited purpose of representing plaintiff through dispositive motions. Alexander L. Nowinskis appointment will terminate when the final order ruling on any dispositive motion(s) has been filed. The deadline for filing dispositive motions in this case shall be Friday, May 31, 2019.(Plummer, M)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/18 GRANTING 47 Motion for Reconsideration to the limited extent that the court has reconsidered its 43 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel in light of defendants' arguments and evidence, and is otherwise DENIED. 43 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel remains in full force and effect. The deadline for filing dispositive motions remains vacated until further order of this court. (cc ADR Coordinator) (Coll, A)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/4/18 GRANTING 44 Motion for Extension. Defendants have 14 days, up to and including 10/18/18, to file a motion for reconsideration. (Coll, A)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/19/18 GRANTING 42 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to contact Ms. Sujean Park, Alternative Dispute Resolution Coordinator, for the purpose of locating an attorney admitted to practice in this court who is willing to accept this appointment. The current deadline for filing dispositive motions, September 28, 2018, is VACATED until further order of this court. (cc: ADR Director) (Plummer, M)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/19/2018 ADOPTING 36 Findings and Recommendations in full. Defendant Macomber is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/21/18 ORDERING that the undersigned's dismissal of defendant Macomber from this action 12 at 6, paragraph 4 is VACATED. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Macomber be dismissed from this action without leave to amend, for the reasons set forth in the undersigned's 04/14/17 screening order 12 at 3-4. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/29/2018 ADOPTING 30 findings and recommendations in full. Defendants' 22 motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is DENIED. Defendants are directed to file and serve an answer to the complaint within 14 days. Plaintiff's 27 motion for a temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/10/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a district judge to this action and RECOMMENDING 22 Motion to Revoke IFP Status be denied, defendants be direct ed to file and serve an answer to the complaint within 21 days after the district judge adopts these findings and recommendations, and 27 Motion for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief be denied without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/6/2017 GRANTING 24 Request for Extension of Time. Defendants are relieved of their obligation to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until further order of the Court following disposition of Defendants' motion to revoke Plaintiff's IFP status. Plaintiff to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to Defendants' pending motion within 21 days after Plaintiff is served with the motion. (Henshaw, R)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lafonzo R. Turner signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/13/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/23/2016 ORDERING, within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Riaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Riaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.M. Duc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?