Hoffman v. Bosenko
Petitioner: Kasey Frederick Hoffman
Respondent: Tom Bosenko
Case Number: 2:2016cv01013
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/2/2017 DISMISSING this action. The court DECLINES to issue a certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R) Modified on 5/3/2017 (Donati, J).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/22/2017 GRANTING petitioner's 5 request to proceed IFP. Petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days.(Yin, K)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/1/2016 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Bosenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kasey Frederick Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Bosenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?